Haryana State Board HBSE 6th Class Maths Solutions Chapter 2 Whole Numbers InText Questions and Answers.

## Haryana Board 6th Class Maths Solutions Chapter 2 Whole Numbers InText Questions

Try These (Page 34)

Question 1.

Write the predecessor and successor of : 19; 1,997; 12,000; 49; 1,00,000; 24,40,701; 1,00,199; 2,08,090.

Answer:

Number | Predecessor | Successor |

19 | 18 | 20 |

1,997 | 1,996 | 1,998 |

12,000 | 11,999 | 12,001 |

49 | 48 | 50 |

1,00,000 | 99,999 | 1,00,001 |

24,40,701 | 24,40,700 | 24,40,702 |

1,00,199 | 1,00,198 | 1,00,200 |

2,08,090 | 2,08,089 | 2,08,091 |

Question 2.

Is there any natural number that has no predecessor ?

Answer:

Yes, 1 has no predecessor.

Question 3.

Is there any natural number which has no successor ?

Is there a last natural number ?

Answer:

No, every natural number has a successor.

No, there is no last natural number.

Try These (Page 35)

Question 1.

Are all natural numbers also whole numbers ?

Answer:

Yes, all natural numbers are also whole numbers.

Question 2.

Are all whole numbers also natural numbers ?

Answer:

No, ‘0’ is a whole number but not a natural number.

Question 3.

Which is the smallest whole number ?

Answer:

‘0’ is the smallest whole number.

Question 4.

Which is the greatest whole number ?

Answer:

There is no greatest whole number.

Try These (Page 37)

Question 1.

Find 4 +5; 2 +6; 3 +5; 1 + 6 using the number line.

Answer:

(a) 4 + 5

The point at the tip of the arrow is 4. Start at 4.

Since, we add 5 to this number so we make 5 jumps to the right; from 4 to 5, 5 to 6, 6 to 7, 7 to 8 and 8 to 9 as shown above in Fig. The tip of the last arrow in the fifth jump is at 9.

∴ The sum of 4 and 5 is 9 i.e. 4 + 5 = 9.

(b) 2 + 6

The point at the tip of the arrow is 2. Start at 2.

Since we add 6 to this number so we make 6 jumps to the right; from 2 to 3, 3 to 4, 4 to 5, 5 to 6, 6 to 7 and 7 to 8 as shown above in Fig. 2.2. The tip of the last arrow in the sixth jump is at 8.

∴ The sum of 2 and 6 is 8 i.e., 2 + 6 = 8.

(c) 3 + 5

The point at the tip of the arrow is 3. Start at 3. Since we add 5 to this number so we make 5 jumps to the right; from 3 to 4, 4 to 5, 5 to 6, 6 to 7 and 7 to 8 as shown above in Fig. 2.3. The tip of the last arrow in the fifth jump is at 8.

∴ The sum of 3 and 5 is 8 i.e., 3 + 5 = 8.

(d) 1 + 6

The point at the tip of the arrow is 1. Start at 1. Since we add 6 to this number so we make 6 jumps to the right; from 1 to 2, 2 to 3, 3 to 4, 4 to 5, 5 to 6 and 6 to 7 as shown in Fig. 2.4 above. The tip of the last arrow in the sixth jump is at 7.

∴ The sum of 1 and 6 is 7 i.e., 1 + 6 = 7.

Try These (Page 37)

Question 1.

Find 8-3; 6-2; 9-6 using the number line.

Answer:

(a) 8-3.

The point at the tip of the arrow is 8. Start from 8. Since 3 is being subtracted, so move towards left with 1 jump of 1 unit. Make 3 such jumps. We reach at the point 5.

∴ We get 8 – 3 = 5.

(b) 6 – 2

The point at the tip of the arrow is 6. Start from 6. Since 2 is being subtracted, so move towards left with 1 jump of 1 unit. Make 2 such jumps. We reach at the point 4.

∴ We get 6-2 = 4.

(c) 9-6.

The point at the tip of the arrow is 9. Start from 9. Since 6 is being subtracted, so move

towards left with 1 jump of 1 unit. Make 6 such jumps. We reach at the point 3.

∴ We get 9 – 6 = 3.

Try These (Page 37)

Question 1.

Find 2 x 6; 3 x 3; 4 x 2 using number line.

Answer:

(a) Let us find 2 x 6.

Start from ‘0’, move 2 units at a time to the right. Make 6 such moves. We reach at 12. So, we say 2 × 6 = 12.

(b) 3 x 3.

Start from ‘0’, move 3 units at a time to the right. Make such 3 moves, we reach at 9. So, we say 3 × 3 = 9.

(c) 4 × 2.

Start from ‘0’, move 4 units at a time to the right. Make such 2 moves, we reach at 8. So, we say 4 x 2 = 8.

Try These (Page 45)

Question 1.

(i) 7 + 18 + 13 (ii) 16 + 12 + 4.

Solution:

(i) 7 + 18 + 13 = (7 + 13) + 18

= 20 + 18 = 38

(ii) 16 + 12 + 4 = (16 + 4) + 12

= 20 + 12 = 32.

Question 2.

(i) 25 × 8358 × 4

(ii) 625 × 3759 × 8.

Solution:

(i) 25 × 8358 × 4

= (25 × 4) × 8358

= 100 × 8358

= 835800

(ii) 625 × 3759 × 8

= (625 × 8) × 3759

= 5000 × 3759

= 18795000

Question 3.

(i) (16 ÷ 4) ÷ 2 and 16 ÷ (4 ÷ 2)

(ii) (28 ÷ 14) ÷ 2 and 28 ÷ (14 ÷ 2).

Solution:

(i)( 16 ÷ 4) ÷ 2= 4 ÷ 2 = 2

and 16 ÷ (4 ÷ 2) = 16 ÷ 2 = 8

.-. (16 ÷ 4) ÷ 2 ≠ 16 ÷ (4 ÷ 2)

(ii) (28 + 14) ÷ 2 = 2 ÷ 2 = 1

and 28 ÷ (14 ÷ 2) = 28 ÷ 7 = 4

.-. (28 ÷ 14) ÷ 2 ≠ 28 + (14 ÷ 2)

Hence there is no associative property for division.

Try These (Page 48)

Question 1.

(i) 15 × 68

(ii) 17 × 23

(iii) 69 × 78 + 22 × 69.

Solution:

(i) 15 × 68 = 15 × (60 + 8)

= 15 × 60+ 15 × 8 = 900 + 120 = 1020

(ii) 17 × 23 = 17 × (20 + 3)

= 17 × 20 + 17 × 3 = 340 + 51 = 391

(iii) 69 × 78 + 22 × 69

= (78 + 22) × 69 = 100 × 69 = 6900